House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {883927/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |