House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {393227/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |