House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {653526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {273721/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Pre-filed |