House
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Conference Committee Report {243227/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Conference Committee Report {243227/1
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Carozza)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Senate Refuses Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Crosby, Qi and Wilson)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {903025/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {903025/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (99-35)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {383220/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Economic Matters
|
|
|