House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-6) | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623022/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |