House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451 | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (37-8) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (120-15) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {303521/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |