House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175 | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |