House
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (125-2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Appropriations
|
|
|