House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (131-1) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Floor Amendment {143822/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {103028/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-2) | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {383427/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |