House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {933722/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Hearing 3/07 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |