House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680 | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |