House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Third Reading Passed (121-14) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Adams) Adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {893222/1 Adopted | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Pre-filed |