House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 780 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-3) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (121-17) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {433821/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |