House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188 | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {773323/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |