House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (107-34) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |