House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Referred Rules | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-2) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {203821/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Pre-filed |