House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 953 | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-1) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {683220/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {843826/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Pre-filed |