House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {213826/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Ways and Means |