House
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bartlett, Valentine and Williams)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Requests Senate Recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {303022/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Referred Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {193229/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2024
|
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Judiciary
|
|
|