House | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 986 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |