House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (106-31) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | House Concurs Senate Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (37-7) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {573929/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Budget and Taxation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-32) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {923023/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |