Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland House Bill HB983 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/15/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *hb0983*  
  
HOUSE BILL 983 
P4, J1   	4lr2584 
    	CF SB 1080 
By: Delegates Guzzone, R. Lewis, Martinez, White Holland, and Woods 
Introduced and read first time: February 5, 2024 
Assigned to: Appropriations 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
House action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 5, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
State Personnel – Maryland Department of Health – Pay Rates 2 
 
FOR the purpose of increasing the number of certain bargaining units for the purpose of 3 
specifying certain pay rates for certain Maryland Department of Health employees; 4 
requiring that the pay rates for certain employees of the Department who are in 5 
certain bargaining units and who work at the Regional Institutes for Children and 6 
Adolescents certain facilities be equal set at or calculated at a certain rate compared 7 
to certain pay rates of the employees who work at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital; and 8 
generally relating to the pay rates of employees of the Maryland Department of 9 
Health. 10 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 11 
 Article – State Personnel and Pensions 12 
Section 8–203(a) 13 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 14 
 (2015 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 15 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 16 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 17 
 
Article – State Personnel and Pensions 18 
 
8–203. 19 
  2 	HOUSE BILL 983  
 
 
 (a) (1) This subsection applies to employees in the Maryland Department of 1 
Health who: 2 
 
 (i) have direct contact with patients; and 3 
 
 (ii) are in a position classified in one of the following bargaining 4 
units: 5 
 
 1. Bargaining Unit D for Health and Human Services 6 
Non–Professionals; 7 
 
 2. Bargaining Unit E for Health Care Professionals; 8 
 
 3. Bargaining Unit F for Social and Human Services 9 
Professionals; [or] 10 
 
 4. BARGAINING UNIT G FOR ENGINEERING, 11 
SCIENTIFIC, AND ADMINISTRATIVE PROFESSIONALS CLASSIFIED AS A TEAC HER OR 12 
A LIBRARIAN; OR 13 
 
 5. Bargaining Unit H for Public Safety and Security 14 
Personnel. 15 
 
 (2) The pay rate for an employee at the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital who is 16 
not receiving a forensic pay premium shall be at least two grades higher than the 17 
employee’s pay rate effective June 30, 2020. 18 
 
 (3) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the pay rate for an 19 
employee in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities 20 
Administration shall be equal to A PAY RATE TWO GRADES HIGH ER OR CALCULATED 21 
AT THE EQUIVALENT OF TWO GRADES HIGHER TH AN the pay rate effective July 1, 2020, 22 
for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital if 23 
the employee works at: 24 
 
 (I) a facility that had a forensic admission rate greater than 75% for 25 
the immediately preceding fiscal year; OR  26 
 
 (II) THE REGIONAL INSTITUTES FOR CHILDREN AND 27 
ADOLESCENTS – BALTIMORE AND ROCKVILLE. 28 
 
 (4) This subsection may not be construed to decrease the pay rate of any 29 
employee. 30 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 31 
1, 2024.  32