House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {273328/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |