House | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285 | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-2) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Economic Matters |