House | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448 | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (38-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {773021/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |