Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (39-6) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (105-32) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {493223/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {633127/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |