Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (117-16)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {543923/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Substitute Committee Amendment {203523/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Reconsider Favorable Report as Amended (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {203929/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {203929/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation
|
|
|