Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 764
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {363429/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Health and Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {693723/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|