Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB1183 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/06/2024

                             
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTING LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb1183*  
  
SENATE BILL 1183 
M1   	4lr2668 
    	CF HB 1358 
By: Senator Carter (By Request – Baltimore City Administration) 
Introduced and read first time: February 21, 2024 
Assigned to: Rules 
Re–referred to: Education, Energy, and the Environment, March 9, 2024 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: March 23, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Natural Resources – Establishment of Gwynns Falls State Park – Focus Group, 2 
Advisory Committee, and Report 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish Gwynns 4 
Falls State Park as a partnership park between the Department and Baltimore City; 5 
requiring that Gwynns Falls State Park consist of certain properties in Baltimore 6 
City and include certain landscapes and facilities; requiring the Department of 7 
Natural Resources and Baltimore City to take certain surveys, convene certain focus 8 
group meetings on certain subjects, and establish a certain advisory committee, and 9 
develop a list of priority needs and associated costs for park improvements; and 10 
generally relating to the establishment of Gwynns Falls State Park. 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 
 Article – Natural Resources 13 
Section 5–1012(a) and (b) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – Natural Resources 18 
Section 5–1012(f–1) 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2023 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 21 
  2 	SENATE BILL 1183  
 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 1 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 2 
 
Article – Natural Resources 3 
 
5–1012. 4 
 
 (a) In this section, “partnership park” means a unit of the State park system 5 
managed by the Department in partnership with a local government, a bicounty agency, or 6 
a nonprofit organization. 7 
 
 (b) The Department may enter into: 8 
 
 (1) A memorandum of understanding with a local government, bicounty 9 
agency, or nonprofit organization to establish a partnership park in the State; or 10 
 
 (2) A partnership agreement with a local government, bicounty agency, or 11 
nonprofit organization to manage a partnership park in the State. 12 
 
 (F–1) (1) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ESTA BLISH GWYNNS FALLS STATE 13 
PARK AS A PARTNERSHIP PARK BETWEEN THE DEPARTMENT AND BALTIMORE CITY 14 
THAT SEEKS TO PROVID E VISITORS WITH ACCE SSIBLE OUTDOOR , NATURE–BASED 15 
RECREATION AND LEARN ING OPPORTUNITIES . 16 
 
 (2) GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK SHALL BE HELD BY T HE STATE AS A 17 
STATE PARK UNDER THE 	PROTECTION AND ADMIN ISTRATION OF THE 18 
DEPARTMENT . 19 
 
 (3) (I) GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK SHALL CONSIST OF 20 
PROPERTIES THAT ARE : 21 
 
 1. OWNED BY THE STATE AND DESIGNATED BY THE 22 
DEPARTMENT TO BE ADMI NISTERED AS PART OF THE STATE PARK; OR 23 
 
 2. A. OWNED BY BALTIMORE CITY OR A NONPROFIT 24 
ORGANIZATION ; AND 25 
 
 B. DESIGNATED AS PART OF THE PARK BY A 26 
PARTNERSHIP AGREEMEN T BETWEEN THE OWNER OF THE PROPERTY AND THE 27 
DEPARTMENT . 28 
 
 (II) GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK SHALL, AT A MINIMUM , 29 
INCLUDE: 30 
 
 1. LEAKIN PARK; 31   	SENATE BILL 1183 	3 
 
 
 
 2. THE GWYNNS FALLS TRAIL; 1 
 
 3. WINANS MEADOW/CARDIN PAVILION; AND  2 
 
 4. THE CRIMEA SECTION. 3 
 
 (4) THE MEMORANDUM OF UND ERSTANDING ESTABLISH ING THE 4 
GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK SHALL DEFINE: 5 
 
 (I) THE ROLES AND RESPONS IBILITIES, INCLUDING FINANCIAL 6 
RESPONSIBILITIES , OF THE DEPARTMENT AND BALTIMORE CITY IN MAINTAINING 7 
AND OPERATING THE STATE PARK; AND 8 
 
 (II) A PARTNERSHIP ROLE FOR THE FRIENDS OF GWYNNS 9 
FALLS/LEAKIN PARK IN SUPPOR T OF THE STATE PARK ’S MISSION AND 10 
VOLUNTEERS . 11 
 
 (5) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ESTA BLISH A SUMMER CONSERVATION 12 
JOBS CORPS PROGRAM FOR HIG H SCHOOL STUDENTS AT GWYNNS FALLS STATE 13 
PARK. 14 
 
 (6) (F–1) (1) THE DEPARTMENT AND BALTIMORE CITY SHALL: 15 
 
 (I) 1. TAKE A COMPREHENSIVE SURVEY OF BALTIMORE 16 
CITY RESIDENTS REGARD ING THEIR ATTITUDES TOWARD: 17 
 
 A. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF GWYNNS FALLS STATE 18 
PARK; AND 19 
 
 B. OUTDOOR RECREATION IN GENERAL, INCLUDING 20 
THEIR INTERESTS IN A ND OPPORTUNITIES FOR OUTDOOR RECREATION A ND 21 
BARRIERS TO OUTDOOR RE CREATION; AND 22 
 
 2. (I) CONVENE FOCUS GROUP M	EETINGS ON THE 23 
ESTABLISHMENT OF THE GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK PARK WITH COMMUNITY 24 
MEMBERS AND STAKEHOL DERS THAT RESIDE OR OPERATE IN THE VICIN ITY OF THE 25 
PROPOSED STATE PARK; 26 
 
 (II) DEVELOP A LIST OF PRIORITY N EEDS AND ASSOCIATED 27 
COST ASSESSMENTS FOR PARK OPERATIONS AND IMPROVEMENTS , INCLUDING: 28 
 
 1. CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS ; 29 
  4 	SENATE BILL 1183  
 
 
 2. CRITICAL MAINTENANCE ; 1 
 
 3. ENHANCED NATURAL RESO URCE MANAGEMENT AND 2 
RESTORATION , INCLUDING IMPLEMENTA TION OF A BIOHABITATS STUDY ; 3 
 
 4. HISTORIC SITE RESTORA TION; 4 
 
 5. ENHANCED OUTDOOR RECR	EATION AMENITIES , 5 
INCLUDING TRAIL IMPR OVEMENTS; AND 6 
 
 6. ADDING PARK STAFF AND PROCURING EQUIPMENT 7 
AND SUPPLIES; AND 8 
 
 7. LAW ENFORCEMENT AND P UBLIC SAFETY; AND  9 
 
 (III) ESTABLISH A STAKEHOLD ER ADVISORY COMMITTE E TO 10 
ADVISE THE DEPARTMENT AND BALTIMORE CITY ON THE SCOPE AND MANAGEMENT 11 
OF GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK THAT CONSISTS OF : 12 
 
 1. A REPRESENTATIVE OF TH E FRIENDS OF GWYNNS 13 
FALLS/LEAKIN PARK; 14 
 
 2. AT LEAST THR EE REPRESENTATIVES O	F 15 
NEIGHBORHOOD ORGANIZ ATIONS FROM NEIGHBOR HOODS THAT BORDER TH E 16 
STATE PARK; 17 
 
 3. AT LEAST TWO REPRESEN	TATIVES OF 18 
ENVIRONMENTAL ORGANI ZATIONS IN BALTIMORE CITY; 19 
 
 4. AT LEAST ONE REPRESEN TATIVE OF A HISTORIC 20 
PRESERVATION ORGANIZATION IN BALTIMORE CITY; AND 21 
 
 5. ANY OTHER MEMBERS AS DETERMINED BY THE 22 
DEPARTMENT . 23 
 
 1. AT LEAST ONE MEMBER O F THE FRIENDS OF GWYNNS 24 
FALLS/LEAKIN PARK; 25 
 
 2. AT LEAST SIX MEMBERS REPRESENTING LOCAL P ARK 26 
ADVOCACY ORGANIZATIO NS, LOCAL ENVIRONMENTAL ORGANIZATIONS , LOCAL 27 
HISTORIC PRESERVATIO N ORGANIZATIONS , AND NEIGHBORHOOD ORGANIZ ATIONS 28 
FROM NEIGHBORHOODS T HAT BORDER THE FUTUR E GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK 29 
SITE; AND 30 
   	SENATE BILL 1183 	5 
 
 
 3. ANY ADDITIONAL MEMBER S AS DETERMINED BY T HE 1 
DEPARTMENT AND BALTIMORE CITY.  2 
 
 (7) (2) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2024 DECEMBER 1, 2025, THE 3 
DEPARTMENT SHALL SUBM IT A REPORT TO THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY, IN 4 
ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, ON: 5 
 
 (I) PROPERTY OWNED BY THE STATE IN BALTIMORE CITY 6 
THAT IS SUITABLE FOR INCLUSION IN GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK; 7 
 
 (II) PROPERTY OWNED BY BALTIMORE CITY OR A NONPROFIT 8 
ORGANIZATION IN BALTIMORE CITY THAT IS SUITABLE FOR INCLUSION IN GWYNNS 9 
FALLS STATE PARK AND FOR WHICH TH E LANDOWNERS ARE WIL LING TO ENTER 10 
INTO A PARTNERSHIP A GREEMENT; AND 11 
 
 (III) THE FUNDING NEEDED TO ESTABLISH AND PROMOT E 12 
GWYNNS FALLS STATE PARK. 13 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 14 
1, 2024.  15 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.