1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *sb0012* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | SENATE BILL 12 |
---|
8 | 8 | | F4 4lr1404 |
---|
9 | 9 | | (PRE–FILED) |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Senator Ellis |
---|
11 | 11 | | Requested: November 1, 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 |
---|
13 | 13 | | Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | College of Southern Maryland – Board of Trustees Membership – Alterations 2 |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | FOR the purpose of increasing the membership of the Board of Trustees of the College of 3 |
---|
22 | 22 | | Southern Maryland; requiring certain members of the Board of Trustees to be 4 |
---|
23 | 23 | | residents of Charles County; and generally relating to the Board of Trustees of the 5 |
---|
24 | 24 | | College of Southern Maryland. 6 |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 7 |
---|
27 | 27 | | Article – Education 8 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Section 16–602(a) through (c) and (h) 9 |
---|
29 | 29 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 10 |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 11 |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 12 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Article – Education 13 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 16–604 14 |
---|
35 | 35 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 15 |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17 |
---|
39 | 39 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18 |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | Article – Education 19 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | 16–602. 20 |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 21 |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | (b) “Board of Trustees” means the Board of Trustees of the College of Southern 22 |
---|
48 | 48 | | Maryland. 23 2 SENATE BILL 12 |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | (c) “College” means the College of Southern Maryland, formerly known as the 1 |
---|
53 | 53 | | Charles County Community College. 2 |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | (h) “Southern Maryland” means the area that includes all of Calvert, Charles, and 3 |
---|
56 | 56 | | St. Mary’s counties. 4 |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | 16–604. 5 |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | (a) The government of the College is vested in the Board of Trustees. 6 |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | (b) (1) The Board of Trustees consists of [nine] 11 members appointed by the 7 |
---|
63 | 63 | | Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate. 8 |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) Of the members: 9 |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | (i) Each shall be a resident of the State; 10 |
---|
68 | 68 | | |
---|
69 | 69 | | (ii) Each shall have completed at least 60 hours of accredited college 11 |
---|
70 | 70 | | work; and 12 |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | (iii) None may be an elected official of the State, a county, a municipal 13 |
---|
73 | 73 | | corporation, or a county board. 14 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | (3) Each of the southern Maryland counties shall be represented by at least 15 |
---|
76 | 76 | | one member who is a resident of that county. 16 |
---|
77 | 77 | | |
---|
78 | 78 | | (4) (I) [By July 1, 2010] SUBJECT TO SUBPARAGRA PH (II) OF THIS 17 |
---|
79 | 79 | | PARAGRAPH , each of the southern Maryland counties shall be represented by at least three 18 |
---|
80 | 80 | | members who are residents of that county. 19 |
---|
81 | 81 | | |
---|
82 | 82 | | (II) BY JULY 1, 2026, CHARLES COUNTY SHALL BE 20 |
---|
83 | 83 | | REPRESENTED BY AT LE AST FIVE MEMBERS WHO ARE RESI DENTS OF CHARLES 21 |
---|
84 | 84 | | COUNTY. 22 |
---|
85 | 85 | | |
---|
86 | 86 | | (c) (1) The term of a member is 5 years. 23 |
---|
87 | 87 | | |
---|
88 | 88 | | (2) A member appointed to fill a vacancy in an unexpired term serves for 24 |
---|
89 | 89 | | the remainder of that term. 25 |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|
91 | 91 | | (3) A member may not serve more than two consecutive full terms. 26 |
---|
92 | 92 | | |
---|
93 | 93 | | (d) Each member of the Board of Trustees is entitled to receive up to $600 a year 27 |
---|
94 | 94 | | for expenses. 28 |
---|
95 | 95 | | SENATE BILL 12 3 |
---|
96 | 96 | | |
---|
97 | 97 | | |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That the initial terms of the two 1 |
---|
99 | 99 | | additional members of the College of Southern Maryland Board of Trustees who represent 2 |
---|
100 | 100 | | Charles County, as enacted by Section 1 of this Act, shall be as follows: 3 |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | (1) One term shall begin July 1, 2024; and 4 |
---|
103 | 103 | | |
---|
104 | 104 | | (2) One term shall begin July 1, 2026. 5 |
---|
105 | 105 | | |
---|
106 | 106 | | SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 6 |
---|
107 | 107 | | 1, 2024. 7 |
---|