Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-31) | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {683223/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {683223/1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/29/2023 | Pre-filed |