House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-10) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {903424/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Pre-filed |