Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-2) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {163224/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Pre-filed |