Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB14 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/12/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0014*  
  
SENATE BILL 14 
C8, Q1, Q7   	4lr1266 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 1281 
By: Senator Jackson 
Requested: October 30, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Budget and Taxation 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 27, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Economic Development – Tourism Zones – Designation and Benefits 2 
 
FOR the purpose of authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the 3 
governing body of a county or municipality to designate, by law, an area within that 4 
political subdivision as a tourism zone under certain circumstances; providing that 5 
the designation of an area as a tourism zone may not preclude the area from also 6 
being designated as a certain arts and entertainment district; authorizing Baltimore 7 
City a county or a municipality to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax 8 
gross receipts from certain admissions or amusement charges levied in a tourism 9 
zone; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing 10 
body of a county or municipality to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the 11 
county or municipal property tax imposed on certain real property and certain 12 
personal property located within a tourism zone; and generally relating to the 13 
designation of tourism zones within Baltimore City counties and municipalities. 14 
 
BY adding to 15 
 Article – Local Government 16 
Section 18–401 through 18–403 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 4. Tourism 17 
Zones” 18 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 19 
 (2013 Volume and 2023 Supplement) 20 
 
BY adding to 21 
 Article – Tax – General 22  2 	SENATE BILL 14  
 
 
Section 4–104(g) 1 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 2 
 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 3 
 
BY adding to 4 
 Article – Tax – Property 5 
Section 9–268 and 9–269 6 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 7 
 (2019 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 8 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 9 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 10 
 
Article – Local Government 11 
 
SUBTITLE 4. TOURISM ZONES. 12 
 
18–401. 13 
 
 (A) IN THIS SUBTITLE THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 14 
INDICATED. 15 
 
 (B) “QUALIFYING TOURISM EN TERPRISE” MEANS A FOR –PROFIT OR 16 
NONPROFIT ENTITY THA T CONDUCTS BUSINESS WITHIN A TOURISM ZONE , SUBJECT 17 
TO THE LIMITATIONS S PECIFIED BY THE POLI TICAL SUBDIVISION WI THIN WHICH 18 
THE TOURISM ZONE IS LOCATED. 19 
 
 (C) “TOURISM ZONE ” MEANS A DEVELOPED ZO NE OF PUBLIC AND PRI VATE 20 
USES THAT IS DESIGNA TED BY A POLITICAL S UBDIVISION FOR THE D EVELOPMENT 21 
OF TRAVEL AND TOURIS M AND LOCATED WITHIN THAT POLITICAL SUBDI VISION. 22 
 
18–402. 23 
 
 (A) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 24 
GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPALITY MAY DES IGNATE, BY LAW, AN 25 
AREA WITHIN THE POLI TICAL SUBDIVISION AS A TOURISM ZONE . 26 
 
 (B) IN DESIGNATING A TOUR ISM ZONE UNDER SUBSE CTION (A) OF THIS 27 
SECTION, THE POLITICAL SUBDIV ISION MAY PROVIDE , BY LAW, FOR: 28 
 
 (1) THE DURATION OF THE DESIGNATION; AND 29 
 
 (2) ELIGIBILITY CRITERIA TO QUALIFY AS A QUAL IFYING TOURISM 30 
ENTERPRISE. 31 
   	SENATE BILL 14 	3 
 
 
 (C) THE DESIGNATION OF AN AREA AS A TOURISM ZO NE DOES NOT 1 
PRECLUDE THE AREA FR OM ALSO BEING DESIGN ATED AS AN ARTS AND 2 
ENTERTAINMENT DISTRI CT UNDER TITLE 4, SUBTITLE 7 OF THE ECONOMIC 3 
DEVELOPMENT ARTICLE. 4 
 
18–403. 5 
 
 (A) IN A TOURISM ZONE : 6 
 
 (1) THE EXEMPTION FROM THE A DMISSIONS AND AMUSEM ENT TAX 7 
UNDER § 4–104(G) OF THE TAX – GENERAL ARTICLE APPLIES TO QUALIFYING 8 
TOURISM ENTERPRISES ; AND 9 
 
 (2) THE PROPERTY TAX CRE DITS UNDER §§ 9–268 AND 9–269 OF THE 10 
TAX – PROPERTY ARTICLE APPLY. 11 
 
 (B) ON OR BEFORE JULY 1 PRECEDING THE EFFECT IVE DATE OF ITS 12 
ESTABLISHMENT , THE POLITICAL JURISD ICTION SHALL NOTIFY THE COMPTROLLER 13 
THAT A TOURISM DISTR ICT IS ESTABLISHED . 14 
 
 (C) A POLITICAL SUBDIVISIO N THAT ESTABLISHES A TOURISM ZONE SHALL 15 
NOTIFY THE COMPTROLLER OF : 16 
 
 (1) ANY QUALIFYING TOURIS M ENTERPRISES TO WHI CH THE 17 
EXEMPTION FROM THE A DMISSIONS AND AMUSEM ENT TAX UNDER § 4–104(G) OF 18 
THE TAX – GENERAL ARTICLE APPLIES; AND 19 
 
 (2) THE DATE ON WHICH TH E QUALIFYING TOURISM ENTERPRISE 20 
QUALIFIED FOR THE EX EMPTION; AND 21 
 
 (3) THE DATE, IF ANY, ON WHICH THE EXEMPTI ON FOR THE 22 
QUALIFYING TOURISM E NTERPRISE EXPIRES . 23 
 
Article – Tax – General 24 
 
4–104. 25 
 
 (G) (1) IN THIS SUBSECTION , “QUALIFYING TOURISM E NTERPRISE” AND 26 
“TOURISM ZONE ” HAVE THE MEANINGS ST ATED IN § 18–401 OF THE LOCAL 27 
GOVERNMENT ARTICLE. 28 
 
 (2) BALTIMORE CITY  29 
  4 	SENATE BILL 14  
 
 
 (I) SUBJECT TO SUBPARAGRA PH (II) OF THIS PARAGRAPH , A 1 
COUNTY OR A MUNICIPAL CORPO RATION MAY EXEMPT FR OM THE ADMISSIONS AN D 2 
AMUSEMENT TAX GROSS RECEIPTS FROM ANY AD MISSIONS OR AMUSEMEN T CHARGE 3 
LEVIED BY A QUALIFYING TOURISM E NTERPRISE IN A TOURI SM ZONE. 4 
 
 (II) THE EXEMPTION AUTHORI ZED UNDER SUBPARAGRA PH (I) 5 
OF THIS PARAGRAPH DO ES NOT APPLY TO THE STATE ADMISSIONS AND AMUSEMENT 6 
TAX IMPOSED UNDER § 4–102(D) AND (E) OF THIS TITLE.  7 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FUR THER ENACTED, That the Laws of Maryland read 8 
as follows: 9 
 
Article – Tax – Property 10 
 
9–268. 11 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “QUALIFYING TOURISM E NTERPRISE” AND “TOURISM 12 
ZONE” HAVE THE MEANINGS ST ATED IN § 18–401 OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT 13 
ARTICLE. 14 
 
 (B) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 15 
GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N MAY GRANT, BY LAW, 16 
A PROPERTY TAX CREDI T AGAINST THE COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORA TION 17 
PROPERTY TAX IMPOSED ON A BUILDING THAT : 18 
 
 (1) IS LOCATED IN A TOUR ISM ZONE; AND 19 
 
 (2) IS OWNED BY A QUALIF YING TOURISM ENTERPR ISE. 20 
 
 (C) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 21 
GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N MAY PROVIDE , BY 22 
LAW, FOR: 23 
 
 (1) THE AMOUNT AND DURAT ION OF THE TAX CREDI T UNDER THIS 24 
SECTION; 25 
 
 (2) ADDITIONAL ELIGIBILI TY CRITERIA FOR THE TAX CREDIT UNDER 26 
THIS SECTION; 27 
 
 (3) REGULATIONS AND PROC EDURES FOR THE APPLI CATION AND 28 
UNIFORM PROCESSING O F REQUESTS FOR THE T AX CREDIT; AND 29 
 
 (4) ANY OTHER PROVISION NECESSARY TO CARRY O UT THE TAX 30 
CREDIT UNDER THIS SECTION . 31 
   	SENATE BILL 14 	5 
 
 
9–269. 1 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION, “QUALIFYING TOURISM E NTERPRISE” AND “TOURISM 2 
ZONE” HAVE THE MEANINGS ST ATED IN § 18–401 OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT 3 
ARTICLE. 4 
 
 (B) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 5 
GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N MAY GRANT, BY LAW, 6 
A PROPERTY TAX CREDI T AGAINST THE COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORA TION 7 
PROPERTY TAX IMPOSED ON PERSONAL PROPERTY OF A QUALIFYING TOUR ISM 8 
ENTERPRISE THAT IS L OCATED WITHIN A TOUR ISM ZONE. 9 
 
 (C) THE MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE CITY OR THE 10 
GOVERNING BODY OF A COUNTY OR MUNICIPAL CORPORATIO N MAY PROVIDE , BY 11 
LAW, FOR: 12 
 
 (1) THE AMOUNT AND DURAT ION OF THE TAX CREDI T UNDER THIS 13 
SECTION; 14 
 
 (2) ADDITIONAL ELIGIBILI TY CRITERIA FOR THE TAX CREDIT UNDER 15 
THIS SECTION; 16 
 
 (3) REGULATIONS AND PROC EDURES FOR THE APPLI CATION AND 17 
UNIFORM PROCESSING O F REQUESTS FOR THE T AX CREDIT; AND 18 
 
 (4) ANY OTHER PROVISION NECESSARY TO CARRY O UT THE TAX 19 
CREDIT UNDER THIS SE CTION. 20 
 
 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That Section 2 of this Act shall be 21 
applicable to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024. 22 
 
 SECTION 4. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect June 23 
1, 2024.  24 
 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.