Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (114-23) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {663027/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Pre-filed |