Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (99-35) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {653921/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {973227/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Pre-filed |