House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (104-30) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Floor Amendment {883625/1 (Delegate Griffith) Rejected (38-98) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {693729/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {753224/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Muse) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {753224/1 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Pre-filed |