Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (107-28) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-10) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Motion Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Gallion) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 10/06/2023 | Pre-filed |