Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Pre-filed |