House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {773023/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {913223/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 10/23/2023 | Pre-filed |