Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (38-7)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee Amendment {403722/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {403722/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2024
|
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/20/2023
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|