Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {273226/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {333225/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |