Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 766 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (35-10) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (114-21) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {183921/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (32-13) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |