Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (100-36) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Pre-filed |