Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (102-34) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (36-10) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Floor Amendment {663429/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Floor Amendment {723328/1 (Senator Watson) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {543024/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Watson) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {543024/1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Pre-filed |