Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 09/18/2023 | Pre-filed |