Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (103-34) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (37-9) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 09/18/2023 | Pre-filed |