Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (99-36) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Pre-filed |