Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Returned Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred Economic Matters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (38-6)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {353825/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Mautz) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {353825/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2023
|
Pre-filed
|
|
|