Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {973923/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Pre-filed |